skip to content

Arif, Beenish

CPSO#: 97077

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 14-15
1145 Morningside Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 0A7
Phone: (647) 352-3621
Fax: (647) 352-3628 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2860 Denison Street
UNITS 101-102
Markham ON  L3S 4T6
Canada
Phone: 905-554-0441
Fax: 647-352-3628
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Arif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Arif ( CPSO# 97077 )

Business Address:
1145 Morningside Avenue
Suite 14/15
Toronto ON  M1B 0A7
Phone Number: (647) 352-3621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:28 May 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active
 Dr. Beenish Arif may practise medicine independently in family medicine, and as
            a hospitalist, only.