skip to content

Arhanchiague, Eneko Rheal

CPSO#: 94351

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room GSE-140
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 499-8218 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eneko Arhanchiague Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Arhanchiague ( CPSO# 94351 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room GSE-140
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ENEKO RHEAL ARHANCHIAGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARHANCHIAGUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
EL - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012