skip to content

Arfeen, Syed Najmul

CPSO#: 99996

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Bengali, English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Great Lakes Medical Centre
25-B Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 2S5
Phone: 905 494 0302
Fax: 905 494 0754 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Torbram Medical Centre
105-10 Father Tobin Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0W9
Canada
Phone: 905 789 1750
Fax: 905 789 1787
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Arfeen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arfeen ( CPSO# 99996 )

Business Address:
10-105 Father Tobin Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0W9
Phone Number: (905) 789-1750

Business Address:
25-B Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 2S5
Phone Number: (905) 494-0302


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Pakistan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYED NAJMUL ARFEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARFEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2013 to 01 May 2013
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2015