skip to content

Arenson, Tarin Romi

CPSO#: 95523

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South East Toronto FHT
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone: 416-469-6464
Fax: 416-699-7766 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. J. Elman & T. Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Elman ( CPSO# 100898)
Dr. T. Arenson ( CPSO# 95523 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
South East Toronto FHT
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone Number: (416) 699-7775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARIN ROMI ARENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARENSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013