skip to content

Arendas, Kristina

CPSO#: 86902

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
27 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Slovak

Education: University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kristina Arendas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 2021