skip to content

Aref, Mohammed Hani M

CPSO#: 95064

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Gulf Medical College Ajman, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: HAMILTON GENERAL HOSPITAL, 237 BARTON ST EAST HAMILTON, ON L8L2X2
Date Received: 06 Jul 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Colorado
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jun 2011 to 06 Jul 2011
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2011 to 06 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2020