skip to content

Archambault-Leger, Stephanie

CPSO#: 92160

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Clinique Medicale des Collines 200 - 895 Ch. Riverside Wakefield, QC J0X 3G0
Date Received: 07 Jul 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2020