skip to content

Arce Salinas, Claudia Haydee

CPSO#: 97367

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2012 to 30 May 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 31 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012