skip to content

Arboleda-Florez, Julio Ernesto

CPSO#: 24979

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:National University of Colombia, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seen at Belleville General Hospital please contact: Belleville General Hospital 265 Dundas Street East Belleville, ON K8N 5A9 For patients seen at the Princess Street office in Kingston please write to: Dr. J.E. Arboleda-Florez 483 River Ridge Drive Glenburnie, ON K0H 1S0
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 02 Dec 1966 to 30 Jun 1967
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1967 to 30 Jun 1968
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1968 to 30 Jun 1969
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1969 to 30 Jun 1970
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1970 to 30 Jun 1971
Resident 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jan 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016