skip to content

Arazi Kleinman, Tal

CPSO#: 85016

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 06 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008