skip to content

Arakgi, Michelle Elizabeth

CPSO#: 114142

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: National University of Ireland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main St W
4E Department of Surgery
McMaster Hospital
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: 905-521-9992 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1-1280 Main St W
David Braley Sport Medicine and Reh
DBAC WB127
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: 9055259140 Ext. 23575
Fax: 9055267397
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ELIZABETH ARAKGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARAKGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Nov 2017 to 08 Dec 2017
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Jul 2019 to 11 Jun 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Sep 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2021 to 04 May 2021
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019