skip to content

Arabi, Nezhat

CPSO#: 94482

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian, Turkish

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
267 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone: (519) 473-2929
Fax: (519) 472-3003 Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:31 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active
             Dr. Nezhat Arabi may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.