skip to content

Arab, Akram

CPSO#: 96100

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall ON  K6J4G8
Phone: (613) 861-5000
Fax: (613) 714-1287 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON  K6H5S5
Canada
Phone: 613-938-4240
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Akram Arab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Arab ( CPSO# 96100 )

Business Address:
25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall ON  K6J 4G8
Phone Number: (613) 861-5000

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AKRAM ARAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARAB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015