skip to content

Apramian, David Alan

CPSO#: 32276

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Apramian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Apramian ( CPSO# 32276 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc, 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID ALAN APRAMIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APRAMIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1981