skip to content

Apostol, Athanassios Tony

CPSO#: 30131

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Apostolopoulos, Athanassios (used until: 17 Feb 1999 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.T. Apostol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017