skip to content

Apitz, Christian

CPSO#: 88141

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:George August Univ of Gottingen, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2008 to 09 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009