skip to content

Aoun, Lawrence

CPSO#: 88768

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: 519-973-4411 Ext. 33319 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Aoun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Aoun ( CPSO# 88768 )

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9

Business Address:
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE AOUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AOUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Jan 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2012