skip to content

Anyanwu, Leonard Uchewuba

CPSO#: 87850

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Feb 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2011