skip to content

Antunes, Paulo Rui Mendonca

CPSO#: 94581

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Nov 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre de Sante Communautaire
de l'Estrie
Unit 6
841 Sydney Street
Cornwall ON  K6H 3J7
Phone: (613) 937-2683
Fax: (613) 937-1729 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinique Privée Avenir MD
3230 boul. Curé-Labelle, suite 308
Laval QC  H7P 0H9
Canada
Phone: 450-688-6161
Fax: 450-696-1019
County: 
Electoral District: 

Clinique Médicale Lacroix
Gatineau
232 Boulevard Saint-Joseph
Gatineau QC  J8Y 3X4
Canada
Phone: 819-778-1330
Fax: 819-778-3455
County: 
Electoral District: 

Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: 613-938-4240
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active
             Dr.  Paulo  Rui  Mendonca Antunes may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.