skip to content

Antunes, Paulo Rui Mendonca

CPSO#: 94581

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
601 Chemin Limoges
Bureau 201
Limoges ON  K0A 2M0
Phone: 613-557-2210
Fax: 613-557-2084 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clinique Médicale Lacroix
Gatineau
232 Boulevard Saint-Joseph
Gatineau QC  J8Y 3X4
Canada
Phone: 819-778-1330
Fax: 819-778-3455
County: 
Electoral District: 

Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: 613-938-4240
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

649 Notre-Dame
Unit 203
Embrun ON  K0A 1W1
Canada
Phone: 613-443-3888
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

1 Nation St
Crysler ON  K0A 1R0
Canada
Phone: 613-987-2683
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec
USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active
             Dr.  Paulo  Rui  Mendonca Antunes may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.