skip to content

Anttila, Vesa Jyrki Juhani

CPSO#: 96944

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Oulu, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2011 to 12 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012