skip to content

Antone, Norbert Irwin

CPSO#: 29773

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Feb 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre P.O. Box 909 Sioux Lookout, ON P8T 1B4
Date Received: 26 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020