skip to content

Antoine, Louis Bernard

CPSO#: 87177

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French, Spanish

Education:State University of Haiti, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4801 South University Drive , 239
The Atrium
Davie, FL3 3028
Davie FL  33028
United States
Phone: (954)249-1984

Additional Practice Location(s)

SAH General Hosp of Sault Ste Marie
Department of Psychiatry
969 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4615
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. B. Antoine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick
USA - Florida
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:27 Jun 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008 Active
             Dr.  Louis Bernard Antoine may practise independently in the area of Psychiatry
            only.