Antiperovitch, Pavel (CPSO#: 100783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAVEL ANTIPEROVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTIPEROVITCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Mar 2017 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 May 2017 to 29 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 30 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 29 May 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 30 May 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2018