skip to content

Anthony, John Stuart

CPSO#: 25611

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Anthony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: 306-1371 Neilson Rd Scarborough, ON M1B 4Z8
Date Received: 12 May 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2021