Anthireya-Kakani, Sophia (CPSO#: 99607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Christian Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone: (519) 472-2060
Fax: (519) 471-7299
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Anthireya Kakani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anthireya-Kakani ( CPSO# 99607 )

Business Address:
Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone Number: (519) 472-2060

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIA ANTHIREYA-KAKANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTHIREYA-KAKANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2014