skip to content

Anselm, Daniel Dominic

CPSO#: 97720

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 15 Jan 2018 to 09 Feb 2018
EL - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 02 Jul 2018 to 27 Jul 2018
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2019 to 03 May 2019
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2019