skip to content

Sawka, Annie Mary

CPSO#: 65043

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1993

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 12EN-212
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3678
Fax: (416) 340-3314 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:29 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNIE MARY SAWKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993