skip to content

Lee, Annesse Yoomee

CPSO#: 84345

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit G
3833 Midland Avenue
Toronto ON  M1V 5L6
Phone: (416) 830-0911
Fax: (416) 830-3392 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Annesse Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee ( CPSO# 84345 )

Business Address:
3833 Midland Ave
Unit G
Scarborough ON  M1V 5L6
Phone Number: 416 830 0911

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:22 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNESSE YOOMEE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012