skip to content

Annamalai, Ganesan

CPSO#: 85750

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Nov 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Depart. of Medical Imaging, Rm 568
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4666 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Annamalai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Annamalai ( CPSO# 85750 )
Dr. S. Sandhu ( CPSO# 85770 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4850

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 568
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Nov 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013 Active
 Dr.  Ganesan  Annamalai  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  diagnostic
            radiology, only.