skip to content

Nagpal, Anil Kumar

CPSO#: 64226

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili

Education: University of Nairobi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 576-8080
Fax: (519) 576-8619 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Paris Sleep Lab
Paris Medical Arts
139 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2M4
Canada
Phone: (519) 442-6389
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anil Nagpal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nagpal ( CPSO# 64226 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
305 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 576-8080

Business Address:
Paris Sleep Disorders Clinic
139 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2M4
Phone Number: (519) 442-6389

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:26 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANIL KUMAR NAGPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGPAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992