skip to content

Angelus, Theodor Miltos

CPSO#: 19466

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Nov 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Nov 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Feb 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998