skip to content

Angel, Aubie

CPSO#: 21728

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: B17 - 2 Champagne Dr Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Date Received: 05 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Aubie Angel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 12, 2018:

Dr. Angel has retired from the practice of medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.