Anees, Syed Muhammad Yousuf (CPSO#: 100004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Apr 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1T3
Phone: (519) 252-4448
Fax: (519) 252-4443
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Department Of Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 252-4448
Fax: (519) 252-4443
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Anees Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anees ( CPSO# 100004)

Business Address:
2475 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1T3
Phone Number: (519) 252-4448

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 252-4448

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Respirology Effective: 01 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Mar 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Syed Muhammad Yousuf Anees may practise medicine independently in Internal
            Medicine, Critical Care Medicine, Respirology and Sleep Medicine.