skip to content

Andrusiak, Tara Lynn

CPSO#: 100880

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Oct 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
449 E Hastings St,
vancouver BC  V6A 1P7
Phone: (604) 255-9766

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARA LYNN ANDRUSIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRUSIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2015