skip to content

Andrews-Alexander, Amy Leann Elizabeth

CPSO#: 85083

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Andrews, Amy Leann Elizabeth (used until: 05 Apr 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Psychosocial Onc/Palliative Care
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6080
Fax: (905) 952-3050 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1329 Golden Meadow Trail
Oakville ON  L6H 3H1
Canada
Phone: (647) 877-6463
Fax: (647) 776-7779
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Andrews-Alexander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Andrews-Alexander ( CPSO# 85083 )

Business Address:
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY LEANN ELIZABETH ANDREWS-ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREWS-ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2009