skip to content

Andrews, Saadet

CPSO#: 96871

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Mahmutoglu, Saadet (used until: 28 Jun 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Turkish

Education: Ege University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:05 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Sep 2021