skip to content

Andrews, Jessica Lynn

CPSO#: 97924

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Tweedle, Jessica Lynn (used until: 08 Oct 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee, ON K7R 2Z4
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301 Ext. 444 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jessica Andrews Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Andrews ( CPSO# 97924 )

Business Address:
Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Suite 218
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA LYNN ANDREWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDREWS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018