skip to content

Andrews, Hilary Anne

CPSO#: 26932

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Oct 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Birmingham, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Apr 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995