skip to content

Anderson, Thomas Howard

CPSO#: 50080

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Apr 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1371 Neilson Road
Suite 311
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 282-5557
Fax: (416) 282-3930 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective:21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 10 Apr 2020 Active
             As from April 10, 2020, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Thomas Howard
            Anderson in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Anderson to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                      DR. THOMAS HOWARD ANDERSON
                                           ("Dr. Anderson")
                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:
                  
                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Anderson, certificate of registration number 50080, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that the ICR Committee referred allegations
                  of professional misconduct against me to the Discipline Committee in a
                  Notice of Hearing dated November 8, 2019 (the "Notice of Hearing"). 

            (4)   I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that after the College receives an original
                  copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, the College will withdraw the
                  Notice of Hearing. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Anderson, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Anderson, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):
                  
                        (i)   PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program, or an alternate course
                              provider indicated by the College, by receiving a passing
                              evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification.
                              I may participate in the PROBE:  Ethics and Boundaries
                              Program through an online/virtual format acceptable to the
                              College, provided that my participation is through real-time,
                              interactive video.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Anderson, will agree to abide by any recommendations of the
                        PROBE program.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Anderson, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Anderson, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        (6) month of signing this Undertaking or, if no satisfactory
                        program is available by that time, by the first possible
                        opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.
            (12)  I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Anderson
                              were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College.  As
                              a result of the College's withdrawal of those allegations,
                              Dr. Anderson will engage in professional education in
                              understanding and maintaining appropriate professional
                              boundaries.  
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Anderson, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                  until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Anderson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into my practice;
                        and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Anderson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Anderson, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, to all Clinical
                  Supervisors and Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 10, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Thomas Howard Anderson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 10, 2020:

Allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Anderson were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. As a result of the College’s withdrawal of those allegations, Dr. Anderson will engage in professional education in understanding and maintaining appropriate professional boundaries.