skip to content

Anderson, Kathleen Eleanor

CPSO#: 97671

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Care Group
710 Victoria Ave E
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 0A6
Phone: 807-624-3400 Ext. 3437
Fax: 8076243716 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kathleen Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Anderson ( CPSO# 97671 )

Business Address:
710 Victoria Ave E
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7

Business Address:
386 Maki Ave
Sudbury ON  P3E 2P2

Business Address:
Northeastern Ontario Medical Office
885 Prete Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3X9
Phone Number: (705) 586-3601

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:05 Nov 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ELEANOR ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 06 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 05 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 06 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 05 Nov 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2018