skip to content

Anderson, Jesse Coleman Benjamin

CPSO#: 97301

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Timmins and District Hospital 425 Algonquin Blvd E Timmins ON P4N 1B5
Date Received: 15 Nov 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia
USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Feb 2012 to 07 Apr 2012
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2019