skip to content

Anderson, Christopher

CPSO#: 96915

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: (519) 252-3632 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 Lens avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: 5199734411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Anderson ( CPSO# 96915 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellete Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
1750 Division Road
Kingsville ON  N9Y 4G7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013