skip to content

Ananthan, Yasotha Diana

CPSO#: 97135

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Xavier University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ananthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 16 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2019