skip to content

Anand, Sumeet Mohan

CPSO#: 90093

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: 416-639-8890
Fax: 416-639-8891 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sumeet Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anand ( CPSO# 90093 )

Business Address:
Suite 401
520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: 416-639-8890

Business Address:
Suite 401
520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 673-9393


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUMEET MOHAN ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 16 Jan 2009
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2012