skip to content

Anand, Arun

CPSO#: 97803

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
The Moncton Hospital
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARUN ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 03 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 02 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2021