skip to content

An, Howard Howe-Wei

CPSO#: 96228

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Unity Health Toronto
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
Unity Health Toronto
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ontario Poison Centre
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOWARD HOWE-WEI AN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2015