skip to content

Amster, Solomon Lawrence

CPSO#: 91799

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 735-1490
Fax: (519) 735-1730 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Erie Street Medical Centre
101 Erie Street East
Windsor ON  N9A 3W6
Canada
Phone: 519-252-0007
Fax: 519-735-1730
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Erie Street Medical Centre
101 Erie Street East
Windsor ON  N9A 3W6
Canada
Phone: 519-252-0007
Fax: 519-735-1730
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Samoila ( CPSO# 82340 )
Dr. S. Amster ( CPSO# 91799 )

Business Address:
206 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-1490

Business Address:
169 Talbot Street South
Essex ON  N8M 1B6
Phone Number: (519) 961-9436


Corporation Name: Hasnain, Sekhon and Sayed-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2011 Active
 
                  Dr. Solomon Lawrence Amster may practise medicine independently in Family
                  Medicine, only.