skip to content

Amos, Elizabeth Jane

CPSO#: 97785

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1-60 Murray St
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative
4th Floor
Box 13
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: 4165864800 Ext. 7884 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH JANE AMOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
EL - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2016