skip to content

Amornputtisathaporn, Naparat

CPSO#: 91849

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mahidol University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 13 Jul 2009 to 28 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Respirology

Queen's University, 29 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011